NETHER KELLET VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and improvement of the Village Hall for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 November 1963: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN HINDE | Chair | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Astley | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wren | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Wren | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maria Steele | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Uttley | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roy Clement | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Waddington | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.52k | £21.09k | £23.20k | £18.96k | £19.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.11k | £14.83k | £24.74k | £18.51k | £39.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 23 March 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 17TH MAY 1955
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NETHER KELLET AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Shaw Lane
Nether Kellet
CARNFORTH
Lancashire
LA6 1EY
- Phone:
- 07740105177
- Email:
- stephen.hinde@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window