NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS UNIT 254 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 521260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sailing, Canoeing, Cooking, Map Reading, Rope work, Engineering, Shooting, Expedition, Duke of Edinburgh Award "D of E", camping out and much more all based around the traditions of the Royal Navy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £17,253
Total expenditure: £22,009

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • St Helens

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS SCC (Working name)
  • NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS SEA CADETS (Working name)
  • T.S WARSPITE (Working name)
  • NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS UNIT 254 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
  • UNIT 254 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT ANTHONY SHELTON Chair
None on record
JOHN PAUL UNSWORTH Trustee
None on record
JOAN UNSWORTH Trustee
None on record
DAVID CHARLES UNSWORTH Trustee
None on record
JANET LYNN SHELTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.96k £5.53k £25.02k £15.43k £17.25k
Total expenditure £17.10k £6.90k £16.84k £12.36k £22.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.88k N/A £3.61k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 February 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
121 ASHTON ROAD
NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS
WA12 0AH
Phone:
01925227653
Website:

No information available