FURNI-RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit the relief of poverty by providing items of furniture / goods to people in need, for example single parents; people on low income and people who have suffered due to the effects of Covid 19.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- West Sussex
Governance
- 20 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Barnett | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Sawyers | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Morgan | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING ITEMS OF FURNITURE / GOODS TO PEOPLE IN NEED, FOR EXAMPLE SINGLE PARENTS; PEOPLE ON LOW INCOME AND PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED DUE TO THE EFFECTS OF COVID 19.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
Station Road
Petworth
GU28 0JF
- Phone:
- 07935873639
- Email:
- leebarnett218@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window