THE SOUND OF THE STREETS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Charity is designed to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of street band and outdoor music (including village and town bands and collective music making practices used for processions, rituals, parades, dances, protests and civic occasions) and the culture, history and traditions through public events, performance,workshops and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £6,700 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Anne Meikle | Chair | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hill | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Jonathan Lang | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Allan | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR STREET BAND AND OUTDOOR MUSIC (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO VILLAGE AND TOWN BANDS AND COLLECTIVE MUSIC MAKING PRACTICES USED FOR PROCESSIONS, RITUALS, PARADES, DANCES, PROTESTS AND CIVIC OCCASIONS) AND THE CULTURE, HISTORY AND TRADITIONS THAT ACCOMPANY SUCH MUSIC THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC EVENTS AND PERFORMANCES, WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONGACRE
WOODHILL
STOKE ST. GREGORY
TAUNTON
TA36EW
TA3 6EW
- Phone:
- 07584239085
- Website:
-
WWW.thesoundofthestreets.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window