YOUTH MINDSET
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to act as a resource for young people aged between 11 25 living in the Milton Keynes area by providing advice and assistance and organising mentoring support and activities as a means of advancing in life and helping young people by developing their skills capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent mature and responsible individuals
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 06 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Wise | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
STUART PALOMBO | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Verity Slaughter-Penney | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Tough | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Grimes-Jones | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Burrows | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Apr 2023 as amended on 08 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 11 - 25 LIVING IN THE MILTON KEYNES AREA BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING MENTORING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aurora House
Deltic Avenue
Rooksley
Milton Keynes
Buckinghamshire
MK13 8LW
- Phone:
- 07513154558
- Email:
- info@youthmindset.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.