SUNSHINE ACTION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our motto is to "feed the hungry and warm the abandoned." Our main initiative involves creating and distributing "fortune bags" which are filled with non-perishable food item and essential supplies for homeless and low-income individuals. We typically partner with other charities and organisations to target beneficiaries in local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yiu Long Adrian Yan | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Aldcroft | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yiu Yeung Mak | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £964 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MATERIAL GOODS TO THE POOR AND HOMELESS IN ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LYTCHETT HOUSE
UNIT 13 FREELAND PARK
WAREHAM ROAD
POOLE
DORSET
- Phone:
- +447863781281
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window