C3 SUNDERLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Jonathan Harding | Chair |
|
||||||
Rachel Louise Broughton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Evan Thomas Holmes Cert CII (MP) | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH THROUGHOUT ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE FOR THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 HAWARDEN CRESCENT
SUNDERLAND
SR4 7NQ
- Phone:
- 07709976835
- Email:
- hello@c3sunderland.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window