MANCHESTER CCRC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are restricted specifically, only for the public benefit, to the advancement of the Christian religion in the Diocese of Manchester principally through the provision of a Church of England church or place of worship in Manchester and by contributing towards the establishment, renewal and revitalisation of churches within the Anglican communion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Manchester City
Governance
- 16 March 2023: Standard registration
- Fabric Church (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dr Mark Daniel Roper MBChB | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Grace Thomas | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Robin Mark Elsdon-Dew | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Edward Parsons | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £294.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JAN 2023 as amended on 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECT") ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE DIOCESE OF MANCHESTER PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHURCH OR PLACE OF WORSHIP IN MANCHESTER AND BY CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS THE ESTABLISHMENT, RENEWAL AND REVITALISATION OF CHURCHES WITHIN THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fabric Church
1 Ardwick Green North
Manchester
M12 6HD
- Phone:
- 01615265813
- Email:
- hello@fabric-church.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window