IMSIS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education in the field of mass spectrometry imaging (MSI), which may include but shall not be limited to the following: -organising conferences and networking events, courses, training, workshops, and student exchanges -provision of research awards, fellowships, and student bursaries -maintaining a website for the collection and dissemination of information on MSI
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- China
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Japan
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 23 November 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Malcolm Ronald Clench | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Peggi Melissa Angel | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Julia Laskin | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Steven Marshall | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Martina Marchetti-Deschmann | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard R Drake | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE OF MASS SPECTROMETRY IMAGING, WHICH MAY INCLUDE BUT SHALL NOT BE LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: - ORGANISING SCIENTIFIC CONFERENCES AND NETWORKING EVENTS, TO COORDINATE COURSES, TRAINING, WORKSHOPS AND STUDENT EXCHANGE THAT PROMOTE TECHNOLOGIES AND APPLICATIONS IN THE FIELD OF MASS SPECTROMETRY IMAGING; - PROVIDING RESEARCH AWARDS, FELLOWSHIPS AND STUDENT BURSARIES IN THE FIELD OF MASS SPECTROMETRY IMAGING; - MAINTAINING A WEBSITE FOR THE COLLECTION AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ON FUTURE AND PAST ACTIVITIES IN THE FIELD OF MASS SPECTROMETRY IMAGING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 BENTLEY ROAD
CHAPELTOWN
SHEFFIELD
S35 1RH
- Phone:
- 01142400882
- Email:
- M.CLENCH@SHU.AC.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.