THE PENIEL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Peniel Centre aims to advance the Christian faith in Hertfordshire and other parts of the United Kingdom and the world as the Trustees may think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 March 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christian Chukwudi Ebechidi | Chair | 14 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Derek Houston Johnson | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ezinne Diana Ogelo | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Adaora Onokwai | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Averkiou | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benedict Olufemi Falegan | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluyomi Adenike Woghiren | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 7 - 8
New River Trading Estate
Fairways
Cheshunt
Hertfordshire
EN8 0NJ
- Phone:
- 07717127870
- Email:
- chris@thepenielcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window