DERBY LIBRARIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running and maintaining free public community libraries, to include loaning books and other items, providing access to computers and the internet, offering educational events and other activities commensurate with a public library for the benefit of the residents of Derby and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
Governance
- 06 February 2023: CIO registration
- SPONDON COMMUNITY LIBRARY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Page | Chair | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Preedy | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Bartlett | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Blake | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £620 | |
|
Total expenditure | £99 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 06 FEB 2023 AMENDED ON 07 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RUNNING AND MAINTAINING FREE PUBLIC COMMUNITY LIBRARIES, TO INCLUDE LOANING BOOKS AND OTHER ITEMS, PROVIDING ACCESS TO COMPUTERS AND THE INTERNET, OFFERING EDUCATIONAL EVENTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES COMMENSURATE WITH A PUBLIC LIBRARY AND B. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sitwell Street
Spondon
Derby
DE21 7FG
- Phone:
- 01332662708
- Email:
- info@derbylibraries.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window