THE MENDED FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our project addresses the mental health needs of hesitant African women by reducing barriers to care, raising awareness, and providing support. We aim to establish a network of community mental health advocates who will engage with women in community centres, places of worship, and social events. These advocates will offer information, support, and resources to help women overcome their hesitation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OGHENERURO KODE | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adama Koffi | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Namiruke Jalogoh | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 January 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 January 2024 | 18 November 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND, BY: • PROVIDING INFORMATION ADVICE, SUPPORT AND SIGNPOSTING ABOUT GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING THROUGHOUT ALL STAGES OF LIFE THROUGH, TRAINING, SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS AND OUTREACH PROJECTS, BOTH ONLINE AND FACE TO FACE; • RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES THAT ADVERSELY AFFECT MENTAL HEALTH; • PROVIDING SPECIALIST SUPPORT AND THERAPY FOR PEOPLE EXPERIENCING MENTAL ILL HEALTH, BOTH DIRECTLY AND THROUGH REFERRAL TO SPECIALIST PARTNER ORGANISATIONS; • ADVOCATING FOR INCLUSION OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND IMPAIRMENTS BY COLLABORATING OR PARTNERING WITH OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 ANSTRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE9 2LJ
- Phone:
- 07861782217
- Email:
- jd_akpos@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window