MATLOCK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Matlock Pre-School Playgroup Association is an OFSTED registered provider of childcare on non-domestic premises on the Early Years register. We provide Early Years care and Education, weekdays term time across two sites for children aged 2 to 5 years. We also welcome families for stay and play activities during holiday times.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 27 March 2023: CIO registration
- 07 February 2024: Funds received from 512263 MATLOCK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Scott Lloyd Forrest | Chair | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Anne Parfitt | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HANNAH EMILY TASSELL | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Morton | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Joanne Tonks | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
205 SMEDLEY STREET
MATLOCK
Derbyshire
DE4 3JD
- Phone:
- 07792353802
- Email:
- matlockpreschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.