RIXTON-WITH-GLAZEBROOK COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of space and facilities for various local organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 27 July 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Ness | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Eaves | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Taylor | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.01k | £14.38k | £255.42k | £34.60k | £114.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.46k | £8.67k | £265.98k | £18.58k | £103.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD JUNE 1972 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 14TH DEC 1971, AMENDED BY SCHEME 16 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 4 JUNE 2001.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
RIXTON-WITH-GLAZEBROOK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rixton With Glazebrook Community Ha
Manchester Road
Rixton
WARRINGTON
WA3 6JZ
- Phone:
- 07851 267891
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window