JUBILEE FOODBANK MARKET HARBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jubilee Foodbank Market Harborough provides food parcels and access to food for people in Market Harborough and the surrounding area when they are unable to access food themselves. People are referred to Jubilee Foodbank Market Harborough by reputable organisations such as Citizen's Advice. Volunteers deliver food parcels to referral agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 31 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Jane Mills MBE | Chair | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Berridge | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Shannon DeSario | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Knight | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Barratt | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharron Brannen BA Hons | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gavin Dean MAHonsACIB | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Atherton | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF FOOD POVERTY IN MARKET HARBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING FOOD PARCELS AND OTHER ACCESS TO FOOD TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH CENTRE
BOWDEN LANE
MARKET HARBOROUGH
LE16 7JD
- Phone:
- 07776141683
- Email:
- jubileefoodbankmh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window