VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall. Situated in a rural area and offers a central point for the residents of that area. Offers social events; across the range of age groups e.g. Brownies and Rainbows to the Over Sixties club; interests, balllroom dancing, quilting; resouces, houses the mobile post office. Operates as a venue to raise funds for services and provision in the village. We now offer post office services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 February 1966: Standard registration
- ST MICHAEL'S ON WYRE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom PENDLEBURY | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
Diane Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 1995 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wilkinson | Trustee | 01 January 1990 |
|
|||||
MR GEORGE TYSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.84k | £22.23k | £8.90k | £11.78k | £15.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.13k | £7.38k | £6.13k | £10.52k | £12.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 July 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL-ON-WYE OR NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michaels Village Hall
Blackpool Road
St. Michaels
PRESTON
PR3 0UA
- Phone:
- 01995679331
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window