The Hidden 20%

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hidden 20% aims to advance education in the subject of neurodiversity and neurodivergent conditions. We will do this by producing and sharing a podcast which facilitates discussions on the different conditions with experts in the field. A longer-term goal being the development of a free-to-access website with links to high quality information and online resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 2023: CIO registration
- PRISM ND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Branson | Chair | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Branson | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Jun 2023 as amended on 23 Sep 2023 as amended on 10 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF NEURODIVERSITY AND NEURODIVERGENT CONDITIONS INCLUDING ADHD, AUTISM, DYSCALCULIA, DYSLEXIA, DYSPRAXIA AND TOURETTE’S IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1. PRODUCING AND SHARING A PODCAST WHICH FACILITATES DISCUSSIONS ON THE ABOVE CONDITIONS WITH EXPERTS IN THE FIELD; AND 2. DEVELOPING A FREE-TO-ACCESS WEBSITE WITH LINKS TO HIGH QUALITY INFORMATION AND ONLINE RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07398186703
- Email:
- ben@hidden20.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window