MEDWAY VICTORY UNIT NO. 648 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sea Cadet Corps provides youth activities for 9 to 17 year olds with a nautical theme, including the ethos and history of the Royal Navy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 2023: Standard registration
- MEDWAY VICTORY SEA CADETS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Eaton | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANINA VILLALTA | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE HEFFERNAN | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIA RICHMOND | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES USING A NAUTICAL THEME AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES, ETHOS AND PRACTICES OF THE MARINE SOCIETY & SEA CADETS (MSSC). IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE, THE UNIT MAY: A. OFFER YOUNG PEOPLE A STRUCTURED ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH TO DEVELOP; B. PROVIDE ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): SAILING (INSHORE AND OFFSHORE), PADDLE SPORTS, POWER BOATING, SEAMANSHIP, NAVIGATION, MARINE ENGINEERING, COOKING, MUSIC, FIRST AID, DRILL, PIPING, AND PUBLIC SERVICE; C. PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO OBTAIN A RANGE OF QUALIFICATIONS; AND D. PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MARINE SOCIETY & SEA CADETS
202 LAMBETH ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7JW
- Phone:
- 02076547017
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window