AL SAFINA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Main objectives are to help low income families to alleviate their poverty and sufferingly taking care of their basic needs food, shelter, water, health and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Bangladesh
- Pakistan
Governance
- 17 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Ilyas | Chair | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sanna Mahmood | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
HARIS SHABBIR | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BANGLADESH AND PAKISTAN, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS TO MEET A BASIC STANDARD OF LIVING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Back Lane
Cambourne
CB23 6FY
- Phone:
- 07848183583
- Email:
- info@alsafina.org
- Website:
-
alsafina.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window