Governing document THE BARLOW INSTITUTE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19 JULY 1926, AMENDED BY SCHEME 27 SEPTEMBER 2000. as amended on 21 Jul 2021 as amended on 06 Apr 2022 as amended on 06 Apr 2022 as amended on 24 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCEOF, (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR (1) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES , AND (2) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF TURTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.