BENE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Perdomo Nostrani | Chair | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Ferreira | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
LEONARDO MARRONI | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Troy Lee Bowler | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Silvia Stanescu | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 January 2025 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 January 2025 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND VULNERABLE ADULTS WHO HAVE DISABILITIES AND/OR HAVE EXPERIENCED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS OR INDIVIDUALS WORKING TO RELIEVE THEIR SPECIFIC NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BENE UK
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07551707702
- Email:
- beneukcharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window