PLANET PENGUIN FOOTBALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIOs objectives are, in particular directed at the inhabitants of Brentford and its surrounding areas, and among children, the elderly and in particular any persons affected by Downs Syndrome in football and other sporting activities. Assisting those with financial and health difficulties to achieve their full potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Hounslow
Governance
- 02 May 2023: CIO registration
- BRENTFORD PENGUINS FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Elizabeth Tysoe | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jonathan Wood | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cockram-Smith | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allan Charles Cockram | Trustee | 02 May 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO BE CARRIED OUT TO BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RESIDENTS OF WEST LONDON, ARE: (A) TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DOWN’S SYNDROME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE ‘FACILITIES’ MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C) FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 EALING VILLAGE
LONDON
W5 2LY
- Phone:
- 07956524875
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window