WHITTINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Community village hall.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,714
Total expenditure: £13,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNA FELL Chair 14 June 2021
None on record
JENNA KELLY Trustee 29 May 2023
None on record
LUCIE BOWDEN Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
GILES BENNION Trustee 14 June 2021
None on record
phyllis pinch Trustee 23 August 2020
None on record
SIMON FITZGERALD Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
HELEN MACKERETH Trustee
CHARITY OF MARY HARDY
Received: On time
KARAN METCALFE Trustee
None on record
BARBARA ATKINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.89k £1.36k £9.37k £14.52k £11.71k
Total expenditure £99.94k £2.96k £24.29k £10.01k £13.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Cottage
Main Street
Whittington
CARNFORTH
Lancashire
LA6 2NY
Phone:
01524271103
Website:

No information available