CATFORTH MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES INCLUDE; CHILDRENS PARTIES, FESTIVALS & FUN DAYS, DOG TRAINING, PRIVATE FUNCTIONS, CUBS & SCOUTS, TODDLERS GROUP, KARATE, ANNUAL & PUBLIC COMMUNITY EVENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,500 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 02 June 1970: Standard registration
- THE CATFORTH VILLAGE CLUB (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Darrel Entwistle | Chair | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Dorothy Entwistle | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Mahon | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne McElhone | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA HADDOCK | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.71k | £16.28k | £17.87k | £40.18k | £21.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.86k | £13.41k | £8.87k | £48.60k | £21.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £12.00k | N/A | £5.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 8 MAY 1920, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 APRIL 2004, AS AMENDED 30 OCTOBER 2006 as amended on 06 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF CATFORTH, LANCASHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH A LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A VILLAGE HALL FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CATFORTH WARD IN THE TOWNSHIP OF WOODPLUMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Catforth Village Hall
Catforth Road
Catforth
PRESTON
PR4 0HE
- Phone:
- 07805724589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window