NELSON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,833 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 March 2023: CIO registration
- NELSON COMMUNITY MASJID (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nisar Ahmed Raja | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Waqas Ali Ashraf | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Zaheer Mahmood Hussain | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £293.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: 1/ THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN NELSON, LANCASHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING AND OTHER ESSENTIALS VIA A FOODBANK TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. 2/ TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH BY PROVIDING A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND PRAYER, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nelson Community Masjid
Bradshaw Street
Nelson
BB9 0BH
- Phone:
- 01282899195
- Email:
- admin@myncm.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window