KINGSCLERE PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is to provide a safe and nurturing environment for Early Years education and development of preschool aged children in Kingsclere and the surrounding community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £79,881 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,302 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 22 February 2023: CIO registration
- 03 March 2025: Funds received from 1035074 BUSY BEES PLAYGROUP (KINGSCLERE)
- BUSY BEES PRESCHOOL KINGSCLERE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Culver | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Beall | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Robson | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Joy Rebbettes | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Helen Campbell | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brandon Sternquist | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £79.88k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSCLERE PRESCHOOL
STROKINS ROAD
KINGSCLERE
NEWBURY
RG20 5RH
- Phone:
- 01635299566
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window