THE TOM BEREZNICKI CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances education in dentistry. It achieves this primarily by providing financial assistance to The College of General Dentistry, who attend additional training courses. In particular it is intended that there will be a competition run by The College of General Dentistry based around the submission of an anterior aesthetic case. Winners are then invited to attend training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Jack Bereznicki | Chair | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karina Kowalski | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronan Lee | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Balraj Singh Sohal | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Denton | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stitt | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Leech | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan George Cowpe | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Keeley | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Nigel Maloney | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Francis Arthur Quinn | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jun 2023 as amended on 28 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE OF GENERAL DENTISTRY (COMPANY NUMBER 02586636) (CHARITY NUMBER 1002769) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE MEMBERS TO COVER THE COSTS OF ATTENDING RELEVANT TRAINING COURSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 LOWER SLOANE STREET
LONDON
LONDON
SW1W 8BP
- Phone:
- 07702848704
- Email:
- tbereznicki@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window