SILVER CORD MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Befriending services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
153 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 2023: CIO registration
- SILVER CORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Steven Jenkinson | Chair | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Grandidge | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martyn Cooling | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Elizabeth Howsley | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1. A) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS PERSONS WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THOSE WHO ARE ELDERLY OR IN POOR HEALTH. AND 3.1.2. B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH MISSIONARY WORK, EVANGELISM AND EDUCATING PEOPLE ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Home Farm Avenue
Mottram-in-Longdendale
Hyde
Cheshire
- Phone:
- 03337721939
- Email:
- admin@silvercord.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window