OXFORD TAMIL SANGAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the arts, culture, and heritage for the public benefit of the Tamil people including all aspects of their language, history, and traditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prabhu Vadamalaiyan | Chair | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sangeetha Jaganathan | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gopinathan Kasiviswanathan | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 February 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 February 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN OXFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE TAMILS OR OF TAMIL ORIGIN BY PROMOTING TAMIL CULTURE AND HERITAGE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CULTURAL EVENTS AND CLASSES TO INCREASE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF TAMIL LANGUAGE, HISTORY, CULTURE, VALUES AND TRADITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 DRYSDALE CLOSE
RADLEY
ABINGDON
OX14 3BU
- Phone:
- 07876751747
- Email:
- admin@oxfordtamilsangam.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window