NORTH BUSHEY FREE CHURCH (BAPTIST)

Charity number: 1201858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our principal objective is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The church does this through arranging and hosting a range of activities for the membership and regular worshippers as well as members of the local community, in addition to our regular Sunday worship.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £35,777
Total expenditure: £44,406

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NORTH BUSHEY BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Owen John Harvey Bsc PGCE Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Jayne Entwistle-Thomas Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.78k
Total expenditure £44.41k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NORTH BUSHEY BAPTIST CHURCH
218 PARK AVENUE
BUSHEY
WD23 2BD
Phone:
07974979346