Trustees HEREFORDSHIRE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 521377

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Unwin | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Vickers | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Brassington | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bucknell | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Thornhill | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen McIlveen | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Davies | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
karen hughes | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bishop | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne-marie Powell | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.