CALVARY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP SILKSWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation is a church. Its main aims are to introduce people to the love of God shown through Jesus Christ, to encourage those who already know God's love to keep trusting in that and to demonstrate God's love in practical acts of kindness. The church's activities on Sundays and through the week are carried out to achieve this purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sunderland
Governance
- 02 May 2023: CIO registration
- 25 October 2024: Funds received from 326158 THE CALVARY TRUST
- CALVARY SILKSWORTH (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN OLIVER | Chair | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Matthew Taylor | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victor Paul Bellas | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Potts | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Malcolm Patterson | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Andrew Oliver | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MURRAY | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Nathan Thomas Oliver | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Benjamin Oxley | Trustee | 21 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 May 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN SUNDERLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; AND 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CALVARY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
1 TUNSTALL TERRACE
SILKSWORTH
SUNDERLAND
SR3 1HH
- Phone:
- 07895895804
- Email:
- calvarysilksworth@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window