Financial history THE ASHBY PARVA VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £7.97k £14.97k £7.64k £53.43k £85.16k
Total expenditure £18.75k £9.18k £8.56k £50.11k £91.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £4.80k £70.50k