KING'S CHURCH BASINGSTOKE

Charity Number: 1202024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, religious education, teachings from the Bible, outreach and pastoral care, all to enlighten others about the Christian religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £67,301
Total expenditure: £9,764

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID TIMOTHY REBBETTES Chair 21 February 2023
None on record
PHILIP JOHN THOMAS Trustee 21 February 2023
BASINGSTOKE FOODBANK
Received: On time
SYLVIA MARGARET POULTON Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
RACHEL ANN REBBETTES Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
STEPHEN GEOFFREY POULTON Trustee 21 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £67.30k
Total expenditure £9.76k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
124 CLIDDESDEN ROAD
BASINGSTOKE
RG21 3HH
Phone:
07768452559