EMMANUEL FULL GOSPEL INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing help, support and provision to those in need via community projects, training, food, warm clothing, skills etc. regardless of race, creed, disability, sexual orientation, age etc - bringing assistance and support, locally and throughout Cornwall and other parts of the UK and world, via activities and friendship. Sharing Christianity in Cornwall, United Kingdom and around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Romania
Governance
- 06 June 2023: CIO registration
- 17 September 2024: Funds received from 1055405 EMMANUEL FULL GOSPEL INTERNATIONAL
- EFGI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN GEORGE CARLIN | Chair | 15 May 1996 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lawrey | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Mancini | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
REMO MANCINI | Trustee | 15 May 1996 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Carlin | Trustee | 15 May 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CORNWALL, ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE BY PROCLAIMING AND FURTHERING THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE UNCOMPROMISED WORD OF GOD (‘THE GOSPEL”) CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH ATTACHED TO THIS CONSTITUTION. B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE IN CORNWALL, UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 TRESAWLS ROAD
TRURO
TR1 3LE
- Phone:
- 07778457813
- Email:
- remomancini@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window