CHARLIES COMMUNITY SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of people who have, or who have had cancer, and their families and carers across Gloucestershire, by the provision of a range of person-centre holistic therapies and support within our Centres, and also to develop home visits for people with cancer to reduce isolation and promote friendship.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 October 2023: CIO registration
- Charlies Cancer Support & Therapies (Working name)
- CHARLIE'S COMMUNITY SUPPORT CIC (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Brown | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalie Sawyers | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LIDDLE | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
KELLY WEIR | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MOUNT | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA HOLBROOK | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DANIELS | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE SUTHERLAND | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Oct 2023 as amended on 26 Mar 2024 as amended on 24 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE, OR WHO HAVE HAD, CANCER, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE, BY THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF PERSON-CENTRED HOLISTIC THERAPIES AND HOLISTIC COUNSELLING WITHIN OUR CENTRE, AND ALSO TO DEVELOP HOME VISITS FOR PEOPLE WITH CANCER TO REDUCE ISOLATION AND PROMOTE FRIENDSHIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2 VENTURE BUSINESS CENTRE
MADLEAZE ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL1 5SJ
- Phone:
- 01452939000
- Email:
- charlies2014@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.