HOUGHTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the foundation is the provision and maintenance of a village hall and recreation ground for the use of the inhabitants of Houghton and the neighbourhood without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use of meetings, lectures and classes and for the purpose of physical exercise and training and other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,580 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Sarah Ridgway Priddey | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ketki Rana | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monica Vondrasek-Price | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Thornhill Pollard | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Pughe | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Bailey | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lock | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Steven Edward Ransley | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Cochrane | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.57k | £19.99k | £19.32k | £17.95k | £17.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.19k | £23.16k | £13.26k | £12.82k | £19.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £103 | £11.00k | £1.47k | £2.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21/05/1970 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/01/2013 as amended on 21 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
HOUGHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Weir Lane
Houghton-On-The-Hill
LEICESTER
LE7 9GR
- Phone:
- 01162416498
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window