HUGGLESCOTE RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a recreation ground for the use of the inhabitants of Ellistown and neighbourhood with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 25 April 1963: Standard registration
- HUGGLESCOTE AND SOUTH LEICESTERSHIRE MINERS WELFARE RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellistown and Battleflat Parish Council | Trustee | 04 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.75k | £1.75k | £1.75k | £1.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.75k | £1.75k | £1.75k | £1.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HUGGLESCOTE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HUGGLESCOTE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NW Leicestershire District Council
Council
Council Offices
Whitwick Road
COALVILLE
LE67 3FJ
- Phone:
- 07949645139
- Email:
- ellistownclerk@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window