AMEN MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carrying out activities in the furtherance of the Christian faith through church events, gatherings and related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tshiela Mamy Kadima | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tracy Ilunga | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Agostinho Jose Buana | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 February 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 February 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 GUNN ROAD
SWANSCOMBE
DA10 0JW
- Phone:
- 07884331346
- Email:
- Ttshielakadima@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window