YESHIVAS KESER HATORAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION, INCLUDING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A YESHIVA KNOWN AS YESHIVAS KESER HATORAH AND BY THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND STUDY AT SUCH YESHIVA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 26 June 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIPMAN BRENIG | Chair | 16 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Daniel Rosenberg | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Mark Fisher | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION, INCLUDING BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A YESHIVA KNOWN AS YESHIVAS KESER HATORAH AND BY THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, RELIGIOUS SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND STUDY AT SUCH YESHIVA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
325-327 Oldfield Lane North
GREENFORD
UB6 0FX
- Phone:
- 07713432302
- Email:
- lippybrenig@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window