WITCHES CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WITCHES CIO offers services delivered by women in trades to women in the community with the aim of empowering women to learn and deliver their own home maintenance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA HILDER | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Josephine Claire Rainford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Mica Hela May | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £33 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF WOMEN VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE IN HULL AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, BY: A) OFFERING A HOME MAINTENANCE SERVICE PROVIDING SKILLED TRADES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PAINTING AND DECORATING, CARPENTRY, PLASTERING, LOCKSMITHING, PLUMBING, HEATING, ELECTRICS, ROOFING, POINTING, GUTTERING, GLAZING, BRICKLAYING, BUILDING, LANDSCAPING AND GARDENING, STAFFED BY WOMEN ONLY OPERATIVES; B) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN HOME MAINTENANCE AND SKILLED TRADES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PAINTING AND DECORATING, CARPENTRY, PLASTERING, LOCKSMITHING, PLUMBING, HEATING, ELECTRICS, ROOFING, POINTING, GUTTERING, GLAZING, BRICKLAYING, BUILDING, LANDSCAPING AND GARDENING, TO ENABLE THE PARTICIPANTS TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT SKILLS, SUPPORT SELF SUFFICIENCY AND BUILD CONFIDENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Preston Road Womens Centre
185 Preston Road
HULL
HU9 5UY
- Phone:
- 07706763883
- Email:
- witches@purplehouse.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window