BOURNEMOUTH UNIT 49 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Built on the ethos and standards of the Royal Navy, Sea Cadet training focuses on water sports and seamanship (carried out on a local river, the sea, adjacent naval establishments) and soldiering skills for Royal Marine Cadets. Cadets can also take national awards such as the Duke of Edinburgh or even attain accredited qualifications in navigation, communication and management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
Governance
- 05 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roberto Rocca | Chair | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||
Kevin Parsons | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|||
Stephanie Pemberton | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|||
Gary Shepheard | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|||
Azeez Balogun | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF THE UNIT (THE PURPOSE) IS TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES USING A NAUTICAL THEME AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES, ETHOS AND PRACTICES OF THE MARINE SOCIETY & SEA CADETS (MSSC).
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOURNEMOUTH SEA CADETS
T S PHOEBE
65 GLOUCESTER ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH7 6JB
- Phone:
- 01202399199
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window