KEGWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a village hall, providing facilities for pre-school, dog shows and seminars, rabbit ,miniature railway , karati , tai chi,,tai kwando classes, various baby sessions,,election-voting,plays and childrens shows , well being and religious events Senior lunches, soup kitchen ,toddler groups,garden club ,WI,weddings,painting,French and dance classes children's parties and village events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 November 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN HAYES | Chair |
|
||||||
Alex Dickson | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Wagstaff | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Forster | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Tansley | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE FOWKES | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBBIE MOODY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.79k | £30.01k | £24.84k | £39.01k | £50.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.76k | £27.04k | £31.66k | £30.65k | £44.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1961.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KEGWORTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nottingham Road
KEGWORTH
DERBY
DE74 2FH
- Phone:
- 01509 673626
- Email:
- enquiries@kegworthvh.org
- Website:
-
kegworthvillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window