SWALE COMMUNITY CARE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Relief of Poverty & Financial hardship for those within the Swale Community, Kent. We aim to deliver this through a range of services and projects based out of Sittingbourne; such as: Community Cafe, free children's meals, food parcels, clothes bank, warm spaces, temporary accommodation, evening soup kitchen, mobile contact and delivery services. Guidance and signposting to support networks
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 07 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Allen | Chair | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Marsh | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Thurlow | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 June 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 June 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEF OF POVERTY: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN KENT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF WELFARE, EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. (2) ELDERLY PEOPLE: TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST ELDERLY PEOPLE. (3) RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN SWALE BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 LORIMAR COURT
SITTINGBOURNE
ME10 5JD
- Phone:
- 07592955867
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window