WEAVE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weave Foundation is a Christian charity that financially supports grassroots projects in Zambia's Copperbelt region and beyond, with the aim of promoting self-sustainability and long-term outcomes. We build relationships and work alongside established projects and local churches. Our mission is to raise the profile of existing non-profit organisations and support them in their important work.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nepal
- Zambia
Governance
- 08 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Smith | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Smith | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Wearring | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Mayhew | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ZAMBIA, BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ORPHANS AND OTHER VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ZAMBIA, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR QUALIFIED TEACHERS, BUILDINGS AND ESSENTIAL EQUIPMENT. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY WORKING WITH AND STRENGTHENING THE WORK OF CHRISTIAN CHURCHES AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, IN PROVIDING GRASSROOTS SERVICES TO COMMUNITIES AFFECTED BY POVERTY AND TO JOIN IN EVANGELISM, CHURCH-PLANTING, PRAYER, THE DISCIPLING OF CHRISTIANS AND THE TRAINING OF LEADERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 TOWN END FARM
WITHERSLACK
GRANGE-OVER-SANDS
LA11 6RN
- Phone:
- 07388008095
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.