FUTURE EARTH LAB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Future Earth Lab is an innovation-focused NGO working to create rapid practical action on climate change and environmental sustainability
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- India
- Pakistan
- United States
Governance
- 12 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS TRISTRAM BERRY | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Anne Sharon Friedman | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Phipps | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Baptiste Carriere-Pradal | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Shea | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Albers | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/02/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT ACROSS THE WORLD, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ALL LIVING CITIZENS, AND FUTURE GENERATIONS. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) CREATING OPEN ACCESS, HIGH QUALITY DATASETS, TOOLS AND TECHNICAL ANALYSIS THAT RELEVANT STAKEHOLDERS CAN USE TO SUPPORT DECISION MAKING ON ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY B) ESTABLISHING PRACTICAL IMPACT REDUCTION PROGRAMMES THAT ADDRESS SIGNIFICANT AREAS OF ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT AND RISK THROUGH THE USE OF INNOVATIVE STRUCTURES AND SOLUTIONS - WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON SOLUTIONS THAT ARE APPROPRIATE FOR GLOBAL SOUTH CONTEXTS C) SUPPORTING RELEVANT DECISION MAKERS TO IDENTIFY TECHNICAL, FINANCIAL AND REGULATORY OPPORTUNITIES FOR IMPROVED ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION D) BUILDING THE ENVIRONMENTAL KNOWLEDGE AND ENCOURAGING ENVIRONMENTALLY FRIENDLY ACTIVITIES IN CITIZENS AROUND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GatherRound Ltd Holy Trinity Church
Monmouth Place
BATH
BA1 2AY
- Phone:
- 01179713445
- Email:
- enquiries@futureearthlab.org
- Website:
-
Futureearthlab.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window