NEW PARKS CLUB FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND CREATIVE ACTIVITIES THAT ARE BOTH EDUCATIONAL AND ENJOYABLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 24 June 1969: Standard registration
- NEW PARKS BOYS' CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Amalou | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marina Bernadette Miller | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sallyanne Julie Girling | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jayne Marshall | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA KEMBLE | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Christine Sherwood | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
peter coley | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.36k | £44.11k | £23.26k | £19.66k | £17.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.30k | £34.60k | £27.90k | £35.61k | £32.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.79k | £11.19k | £1.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/01/1965 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2009
Charitable objects
BOYS' CLUB
Area of benefit
LEICESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Parks Boys Club
New Parks Boulevard
LEICESTER
LE3 9SB
- Phone:
- 01162876904
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window