THURNBY LODGE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity continues to support all residents in an outer city estate in a Leicester City Council building. It acts as an umbrella group to support and guide many small groups. Last year the association celebrated its fiftieth anniversary. It has now invested into a training computer suite. Accounts available.In the past year we have lost 2 user groups. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £10,209 from government contract(s) and £10,521 from government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicester City
Governance
- 25 October 1966: Standard registration
- THURNBYLODGE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Teresa Louise Aldred | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|||||
REV Lynn Beverley Padmore | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN GRATRIX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.51k | £17.64k | £19.69k | £19.34k | £23.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.74k | £15.51k | £15.95k | £21.15k | £12.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £10.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £10.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 2ND OCTOBER 1961
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL BEING OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND PLAYING FIELDS.
Area of benefit
THURNBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 BRYNGARTH CRESCENT
LEICESTER
LE5 2AF
- Phone:
- 01162929765
- Email:
- tigger_1938@Yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window