FRIENDS OF HARROGATE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Harrogate Hospital, we are all volunteers, we have no paid staff or offices. We raise money to purchase equipment for Harrogate District Hospital to enhance the patient experience. Our area of operation is the sae as HDFT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MICHAEL FOX | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muriel Helen Metcalfe | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Francis Steen | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeannette Carol Wilson | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Ann Cullingworth | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Sylvia Molly Bagnall | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY TUNESI | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Albert Thomas Day | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN AND AROUND HARROGATE, NORTH YORKSHIRE. 2. TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESSES, BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES ANCILLARY TO THOSE PROVIDED BY STATUTORY AUTHORITIES IN AND AROUND HARROGATE, NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 MALDEN ROAD
HARROGATE
HG1 4SF
- Phone:
- 01423540541
- Email:
- johnm.fox93@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window