NORTHWAY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides a public place of worship on Northway Estate, Oxford, offering services of worship and pastoral care to its members and the local community, and allows its building to be used for church and community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 March 2023: CIO registration
- Northway Evangelical Church (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Floate | Chair | 05 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Heather Elbourn | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Walton | Trustee | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGHOUT OXFORDSHIRE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRACTICES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP, PRAYER, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, CELEBRATING RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, CONDUCTING RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES, MISSIONARY WORK, OUTREACH AND PASTORAL CARE IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUTTON ROAD
HEADINGTON
OXFORD
OX3 9RB
- Phone:
- 07871473754
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window